EP3947407 - SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF GALECTIN-3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chunjian c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 02 /
YOON, David S. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 03 /
WANG, Wei 18 Cloverdale Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
FENG, Jianxin c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 05 /
ELLSWORTH, Bruce A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 06 /
REGUEIRO-REN, Alicia c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LIU, Chunjian Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | ||
02 /
YOON, David S. Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Wei Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
FENG, Jianxin Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | |||
05 /
ELLSWORTH, Bruce A. Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | |||
06 /
REGUEIRO-REN, Alicia Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20719877.1 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24548 | Priority number, date | US201962823684P | 26.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823684 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198266 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947407 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3947407 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/056 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61P9/10 (EP,KR);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4196 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP,KR);
A61P11/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEIN MOLEKUL GALECTIN-3 HEMMER | [2024/04] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE INHIBITORS OF GALECTIN-3 | [2022/06] | French: | INHIBITEURS MOLECULES PETITES DE LA GALECTIN-3 | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/06] | KLEINMOLEKÜLIGE INHIBITOREN VON GALECTIN-3 | ||
Former [2022/06] | INHIBITEURS À PETITES MOLÉCULES DE GALECTINE -3 | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 25.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005113569 (FORSKAPATENT I SYD AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2016120403 (GALECTO BIOTECH AB [DK]); | [A]WO2018011094 (GALECTO BIOTECH AB [DK]); | [A]WO2018209255 (GALECTIN SCIENCES LLC [US]); | [XP]WO2019067702 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) | by applicant | WO2005113568 | WO2005113569 | US2014067986 | US2014099319 | WO2014067986 | WO2016120403 | WO2017080971 | WO2018209255 |