EP3958697 - AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE WITH PROTECTED AIR INLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/11] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products, S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMETT, Robert Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
SAADE LATORRE, Eva Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Siepmann, Felix, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20720084.1 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020EP61546 | Priority number, date | EP20190171003 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19171003 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216943 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958697 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958697 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/485, // A24F40/10 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A24F40/46 (KR);
A24F7/00 (KR);
A24F7/02 (US);
A24F40/20 (KR);
A24F40/42 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT GESCHÜTZTEM LUFTEINLASS | [2022/09] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE WITH PROTECTED AIR INLET | [2022/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AVEC ADMISSION D'AIR PROTÉGÉE | [2022/48] |
Former [2022/09] | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AVEC ENTRÉE D'AIR PROTÉGÉE | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2017013878 (SCHULER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8-14 * paragraphs [0038] - [0092]; figures 3, 6A,6B * [I] 2,5-7,15; | [A]WO2017051150 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* page 12, lines 16-37; figure 9B *; | [XI]US2018146716 (CHEN WEN [CN]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10-14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0058]; figure 2 * [I] 2,5-7,15; | [XI]WO2019012145 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8-14 * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 25; figure 2 * [I] 2,5-7,15; | [A]CN109619698 (CHANGZHOU PAITENG ELECTRONIC TECH SERVICE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0162]; figure 4 * |