EP3952690 - CONDUCTIVE GARMENT FASTENING PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prym Intimates Group Limited B03, 3/F, Block B, Chung Mei Centre 15B Hing Yip Street Kwun Tong, Kowloon / HK | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Prym Intimates Group Ltd. B03, 3/F, Block B, Chung Mei Centre 15B Hing Yip Street Kwun Tong, Kowloon / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAVISEKARA, Heenatikumbure Kavisekara M.A.P. Kandy / LK | 02 /
JAYASURIYA, Jayasuriya Arachchige P.D. Gonahena Kadawatha / LK | 03 /
SAJEEWA, Hapuarachchige Don R. Ihala Lunugama Wanaluwava / LK | 04 /
KUMARA, Hettige Don Dinesh 317/A, Rajasinghe Mawatha Hewagama Kaduwela / LK | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/07] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20720146.8 | 06.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020SG50211 | Priority number, date | GB20190005188 | 12.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201905188 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209794 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952690 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3952690 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/28, H05K3/10, A44B13/00, A44B17/00, A41F1/00, A41D1/00, H05K1/03 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
A44B13/0052 (EP,US);
A41F1/006 (EP,GB,US);
A41D1/005 (EP,GB,US);
A41F1/00 (GB);
A44B17/0058 (EP,US);
H01R4/28 (EP,US);
H05K1/038 (EP,US);
H05K3/103 (EP,US);
A41B2300/324 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | A44B13/00, A44B17/00, A41F1/00, A41D1/00, H05K1/03, H01R12/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITENDES BEKLEIDUNGSBEFESTIGUNGSPRODUKT | [2022/07] | English: | CONDUCTIVE GARMENT FASTENING PRODUCT | [2022/07] | French: | PRODUIT DE FIXATION DE VÊTEMENT CONDUCTEUR | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 11.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6350129 (GORLICK MICHAEL M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2853499 (WELL DONE CONCEPTS S A S [FR]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [A]GB2436718 (SENTRIX TECHNOLOGY LTD [HK]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP2622981 (TEXCO HOOK & EYE TAPE LTD [CN]) [A] 14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2018007990 (MORITO CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract * |