EP3755668 - CHEMICALLY STRENGTHENABLE MACHINABLE GLASS-CERAMICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEALL, George Halsey 16 Woodland Drive Big Flats New York 14814 / US | 02 /
FINKELDEY, John Philip 1683 Tannery Hill Road Elkland Pennsylvania 16920 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Charlene Marie 222 Watauga Avenue Corning New York 14830 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20720156.7 | 18.03.2020 | [2021/01] | WO2020US23238 | Priority number, date | US201962828460P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828460 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205237 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755668 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/078, C03C3/085, C03C3/091, C03C3/112, C03C10/00, C03C10/16, C03C21/00, C03C10/08, C03C10/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C03C3/078 (EP,KR);
C03C10/0045 (EP,KR,US);
C03B25/02 (US);
C03B32/02 (US);
C03C10/0009 (US);
C03C10/0018 (EP,KR,US);
C03C10/0054 (US);
C03C10/16 (EP,KR,US);
C03C21/002 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/085 (EP,KR);
C03C3/091 (EP,KR);
C03C3/112 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | CHEMISCH VERSTÄRKTE, BEARBEITBARE GLASKERAMIKEN | [2021/01] | English: | CHEMICALLY STRENGTHENABLE MACHINABLE GLASS-CERAMICS | [2021/01] | French: | VITROCÉRAMIQUE USINABLE CHIMIQUEMENT RENFORCÉE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 24.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2432662 (CORNING GLASS WORKS) [X] 1-4,7-20,22,23,28-30 * page 12; examples 1-2,12; table 1 *[A] 21,24-27,31-33; | [XA]US4786617 (ANDRIEU ANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-20,22,23,28-30 * examples 1-22; table 1 * [A] 21,24-27,31-33; | [XA]US5070043 (AMUNDSON JR W DUANE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-20,22,23,28-30 * col. 5 specific embodiment; columns 2,4,6, lines 15-17;14,15;10-25 * [A] 21,24-27,31-33; | [XA]US6080692 (REISE MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-20,22,23,28-30 * abstract; columns 1, 2; example 1 * [A] 21,24-27,31-33; | [I]WO2016134677 (SCHOTT GLASS TECH (SUZHOU) CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-5,7-33 * abstract , and p.25 l.5-10, p.26 l.5-6, p.29, p.30; pages 1,5,10, lines 6-10;1-17;25-29; - pages 11,20,21, lines 1,2,6,25-27;16+24,29;1,4,7,25,29-30; examples 4,5,6,9; table 1 * | by applicant | US2920971 | US3689293 | US3732087 | US3756838 | US3839055 | US3997352 | US4431420 | US4624933 | US4652312 | US4935387 | US4948758 | US5246889 | US6375729 | US6645285 | WO2004071979 | EP1706221 | US9780124 | US9790125 | US2018155235 | - Dana's New Mineralogy, John Wiley & Sons, (19970000), pages 1444 - 1446 | - G. BEALL et al., "Ion Exchange in Glass-Ceramics", Frontiers in Materials, (20160000), vol. 3, page 41 | - "9.6.1 Quantitative Measurement of Translucency or Opacity", E. EL-MELIEGY et al., Glasses and Glass Ceramics for Medical Applications, Springer, (20120000), pages 156 - 157 | - "and its progeny, all herein incorporated by reference) Standard Test Methods for Vickers Indentation Hardness of Advanced Ceramics", ASTM C1327, ASTM International | - J. NEUGENBAUER, Determination of Bending Tensile Strength of Thin Glass | - S. MALKINM. HUERTA, "Glass grinding mechanisms and influence on the finished surface and strength", The Science of Ceramic Machining and Surface Finishing, (19790000), vol. II, pages 93 - 106 |