EP3949231 - DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURATION AND ADAPTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Kingstar Technologies, Inc. 5859 Pacific Center Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Huaming 17634 Alva Rd San Diego, California 92127 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
WU, Huaming San Diego, California 92127 / US | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20720217.7 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24427 | Priority number, date | US201962827629P | 01.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962827629 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205330 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949231 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3949231 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W24/10, H04L27/26, H04W72/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L27/261 (EP);
H04L27/2646 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04L5/00, H04W72/00, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURATION UND ADAPTION VON DEMODULATIONSREFERENZSIGNALEN | [2022/06] | English: | DEMODULATION REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURATION AND ADAPTATION | [2022/06] | French: | CONFIGURATION ET ADAPTATION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE DÉMODULATION | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 29.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 06.09.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 28.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2017184058 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1,11,18 * sentence 21, paragraph 14 - sentence 5, paragraph 15 * * page 21, line 29 - line 30 * * claims 1,8 * [I] 2-10,12-17,19,20; | [XI]US2018048446 (JIANG LIBIN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,18 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0082] * [I] 2-10,12-17,19,20; | [XI]WO2019015587 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,11,18 * paragraph [0323] * * paragraph [0347] *[I] 2-10,12-17,19,20; | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Sidelink data channel design of NR V2X", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1808938, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1808938%2Ezip, (20180810), XP051516313 [X] 1,11,18 * Section 2.1 * [I] 2-10,12-17,19,20 |