EP3946089 - FORCEPS WITH TWO-PART DRIVE BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gyrus ACMI, Inc. d/b/a Olympus Surgical Technologies America 136 Turnpike Road Southborough, MA 01772 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENSCH, John 2016 Oakview Lane Plymouth, Minnesota 55441 / US | 02 /
HOLTON, Jeffrey D. 48972 Anchor Avenue Stanchfield, Minnesota 55080 / US | 03 /
BLUS, Theodor C. 4268 Norma Avenue Arden Hills, Minnesota 55112 / US | 04 /
KROLL, Mark 1161 River Road Dresser, Wisconsin 54009 / US | 05 /
MENSCH, John 2016 Oakview Plymouth, Minnesota 55441 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
MENSCH, John Plymouth, Minnesota 55441 / US | ||
02 /
HOLTON, Jeffrey D. Stanchfield, Minnesota 55080 / US | |||
03 /
BLUS, Theodor C. Arden Hills, Minnesota 55112 / US | |||
04 /
KROLL, Mark Dresser, Wisconsin 54009 / US | |||
05 /
MENSCH, John Plymouth, Minnesota 55441 / US | Representative(s) | Noack, Andreas c/o Stolmár & Partner Neuer Wall 71 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20720256.5 | 25.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24744 | Priority number, date | US201962826522P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962826522 P | US201962826532P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962826532 P | US201962841476P | 01.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962841476 P | US202062994220P | 24.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994220 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205374 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946089 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B18/14 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/282 (US);
A61B17/1285 (US);
A61B17/2804 (US);
A61B17/2833 (US);
A61B17/285 (US);
A61B17/2909 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/320092 (KR);
A61B18/1445 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/149 (US);
A61B90/03 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/21 (US);
A61B17/295 (US);
A61B18/1442 (US);
A61B18/1447 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP);
A61B2017/2845 (US);
A61B2017/2901 (US);
A61B2017/2902 (KR,US);
A61B2017/2903 (US);
A61B2017/2908 (US);
A61B2017/2912 (US);
A61B2017/2916 (US);
A61B2017/2917 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/2919 (US);
A61B2017/292 (US);
A61B2017/2925 (US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/2933 (US);
A61B2017/2936 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/294 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/2945 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/2946 (US);
A61B2017/2947 (US);
A61B2017/2948 (US);
A61B2017/320052 (US);
A61B2017/320095 (KR,US);
A61B2018/00148 (US);
A61B2018/00196 (US);
A61B2018/00202 (US);
A61B2018/00309 (US);
A61B2018/00345 (US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00636 (US);
A61B2018/0091 (US);
A61B2018/00916 (US);
A61B2018/00946 (US);
A61B2018/00952 (US);
A61B2018/1412 (US);
A61B2018/1455 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ZANGE MIT ZWEITEILIGER ANTRIEBSSTANGE | [2022/06] | English: | FORCEPS WITH TWO-PART DRIVE BAR | [2022/06] | French: | PINCE AVEC BARRE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT EN DEUX PARTIES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013085491 (TWOMEY JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US8523893 (KESSLER STEVEN C [US]); | [IY]US9668807 (SIMS GRANT T [US], et al) |