EP3969080 - TRIGGERING MECHANISM FOR A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHL Medical AG Gubelstrasse 22 PO Box 7710 6302 Zug / CH | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAXFIELD, Brian 3853 Satin Leaf Court Delray Beach, Florida FL 33445 / US | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20720464.5 | 27.04.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP61608 | Priority number, date | US201962849275P | 17.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962849275 P | EP20190176654 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19176654 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020233946 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969080 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61M5/32 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A61M5/3243 (EP,US);
A61M5/2466 (US);
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61M5/3293 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2013 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2474 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3267 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | AUSLÖSUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE MEDIKAMENTENABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/12] | English: | TRIGGERING MECHANISM FOR A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/12] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DÉCLENCHEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 08.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2011126439 (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,12,13 * page 14, line 14 - page 16, line 22 ** figures 4-6 *; | [X]WO2015140262 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1,3,4,7,12,15 * page 13, line 20 - page 16, line 33 * * figures 3-9 *; | [XAI]WO2017089278 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1-7,15 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 14, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 8-11 [I] 12; | [XI]WO2017089287 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 12,14,15 | by applicant | WO2018136840 |