EP3970118 - AUTOMATIC GENERATION OF STYLIZED ICONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Jianlong MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
WANG, Jinpeng MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
LIN, Chin-Yew MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20720564.2 | 19.03.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US23461 | Priority number, date | CN201910395510 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910395510 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020231513 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970118 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06F8/38 (CN);
G06F3/04817 (CN,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06T11/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ERZEUGUNG VON STILISIERTEN SYMBOLEN | [2022/12] | English: | AUTOMATIC GENERATION OF STYLIZED ICONS | [2022/12] | French: | GÉNÉRATION AUTOMATIQUE D'ICÔNES STYLISÉES | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |