EP3946515 - WINGED NEEDLE SET SECUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIDU, Jithendra Kumar Sathyanarayana Nr. 09-87, Block 682A Woodlands Drive-62 Woodlands 731682 / SG | [2024/34] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
NAIDU, Jithendra Kumar Sathyanarayana Woodlands 731682 / SG | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20721021.2 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25277 | Priority number, date | US201962824787P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824787 P | US202016830912 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: US202016830912 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198607 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946515 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3946515 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/162, A61M25/00, A61M39/04, A61M39/10 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61M39/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M25/0097 (EP,KR);
A61M25/0606 (KR,US);
A61M25/0625 (KR,US);
A61M25/0637 (KR,US);
A61M25/065 (CN,KR);
A61M39/1011 (CN,KR,US);
A61M5/162 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,KR);
A61M2039/1033 (CN,KR);
A61M2039/1077 (CN,KR);
A61M25/0693 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NADELSETSICHERUNG MIT FLÜGEL | [2024/12] | English: | WINGED NEEDLE SET SECUREMENT | [2022/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ARRIMAGE DE AIGUILLE À AILETTES | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/06] | FIXIERUNG EINES NADELSETS MIT FLÜGELN | ||
Former [2022/06] | FIXATION D'ENSEMBLE D'AIGUILLES À AILETTES | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5135489 (JEPSON STEVEN C [US], et al); | [IA]WO9303787 (ICU MEDICAL INC [US]); | [IA]WO2007052278 (FLEXICATH LTD [IL], et al); | [XAI]US2013079730 (MOSLER THEODORE J [US], et al) |