EP3965719 - AQUEOUS COSMETIC PREPARATION CONTAINING DISPERSED WAX PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIRING, Uta Im Dahlen 12 a 21077 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
NILSSON, Jan Hellbrookkamp 43 22177 Hamburg / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Beiersdorfstraße 1 - 9 22529 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20721177.2 | 20.04.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP60996 | Priority number, date | DE201910206788 | 10.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206788 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020229097 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965719 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/04, A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/92, A61K8/46, A61K8/44, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/10 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61K8/044 (EP);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNG MIT DISPERGIERTEN WACHSPARTIKELN | [2022/11] | English: | AQUEOUS COSMETIC PREPARATION CONTAINING DISPERSED WAX PARTICLES | [2022/11] | French: | PRÉPARATION COSMÉTIQUE AQUEUSE CONTENANT DES PARTICULES DE CIRE DISPERSÉES | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 10.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2006030501 (NIEBAUER MICHAEL F [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12,14,16 * example - * * claim - * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0159] * [Y] 1-16 [I] 1-16; | [XYI]US2014105944 (PISTORIO BRADFORD JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-12,14,16 * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1-16 [I] 1-16; | [XYI]EP1329213 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,14,15 * paragraph [0030]; example 1 * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] * [Y] 1-16 [I] 1-16; | [IY]DE69108277T (OREAL [FR]) [I] 1-16 * claim - * [Y] 1-16; | [XYI]WO03037293 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,14-16 * tables 3,4a,4b * * claim - * [Y] 1-16 [I] 1-16 | [Y] - anonymous, "Anti-Ageing Gentle Exfoliating Scrub", GNPD, MINTEL, (20100910), Database accession no. 1392318, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055714451 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * |