EP3962301 - AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE HAVING A MOVEABLE CLOSURE WITH A DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHUIGUIR, Layth Sliman Chemin de la Roselière 52 1293 Bellevue / CH | 02 /
MASON, Jon Flat 2, 1 Denbigh Road West Ealing London Greater London W13 8QA / GB | 03 /
LYELL, Nathan 81 Olympian Heights Guildford Road Woking Surrey GU22 7RN / GB | 04 /
PLEVNIK, Marko 112 Savernake Road London Greater London NW3 2JR / GB | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20721261.4 | 30.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020EP62072 | Priority number, date | EP20190172661 | 03.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19172661 | EP20200158043 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20158043 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225105 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962301 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/51, A24F40/60, A24F40/20 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A24F40/60 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (EP,KR);
A24F40/42 (US);
A24F40/51 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/53 (KR,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM BEWEGLICHEN VERSCHLUSS MIT EINEM DETEKTOR | [2022/10] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE HAVING A MOVEABLE CLOSURE WITH A DETECTOR | [2022/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE FERMETURE MOBILE AVEC UN DÉTECTEUR | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013042865 (MONSEES JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 5 ** paragraphs [0060] , [0071] , [0072] , [0 89] , [0091] *; | [XAI]US2016235124 (KRIETZMAN MARK [US]) [X] 1,2,10,12 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0050] * [A] 13-31 [I] 3-9,11; | [XAI]US2017304567 (ADELSON ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1,2,10,12 * figures 1, 4a,b * * paragraph [0046] * [A] 13-19,21-24 [I] 3-9,11,20,25-31; | [XAY]WO2018216961 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [X] 20,25,26 * figures 5,10 * [A] 27-31 [Y] 21-24; | [Y]WO2019047955 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 21-24 * figure - *; | [P]EP3632240 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [P] * figures 5,10 * * paragraphs [0121] - [0131] *; | EP3669679 [ ] (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0025] * |