EP3963673 - SPRING TERMINAL FOR CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 26 32758 Detmold / DE | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEHLING, Stephan Hans-Hüls-Str. 6 32791 Lage / DE | 02 /
STJEPANOVIC, Karlo Libellenweg 12 33609 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
HANNING, Walter Am Langen Grund 66 32758 Detmold / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDTPOTT, Heike Jahnstr. 2A 32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20721537.7 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020EP61350 | Priority number, date | DE201910111453 | 03.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019111453 | [2022/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224979 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963673 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3963673 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, // H01R9/26 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H01R4/4833 (EP,US);
H01R4/4835 (EP,US);
H01R9/26 (EP,US);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/484 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H01R4/48, H01R9/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEDERKRAFTKLEMME FÜR LEITER | [2022/10] | English: | SPRING TERMINAL FOR CONDUCTOR | [2022/10] | French: | BORNE À RESSORT DESTINÉE À UN CONDUCTEUR | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 03.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202010008028U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]); | [XI]DE202017103185U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XI]EP3358679 (HAGER ELECTRO SAS [FR]) | by applicant | US7997915 | EP2768079 | DE202017103185U |