EP3962673 - A HOT PRESS FORMING APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR HOT PRESS FORMING A BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOTECH ENGINEERING S.L. AIC-Automotive Intelligence Center Parque Empresarial Boroa P2-A4 Local 6 48340 Amorebieta-Etxano, Bizkaia / ES | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDBERG, Lars Pellvägen 22 975 93 Luleå / SE | 02 /
INNALA, Joakim Morgärdan 21 975 93 Luleå / SE | 03 /
ULFBERG, Petter Lingonstigen 139 973 33 Luleå / SE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Götgatan 78 118 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20721844.7 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020SE50396 | Priority number, date | SE20190050511 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: SE 1950511 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222688 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962673 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/22, B21D22/02, B21D37/01 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B21D22/022 (EP,US);
B21D37/01 (EP,US);
B21D37/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | HEISSPRESSFORMVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HEISSPRESSFORMEN EINES ROHLINGS | [2022/10] | English: | A HOT PRESS FORMING APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR HOT PRESS FORMING A BLANK | [2022/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMAGE PAR PRESSAGE À CHAUD ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMAGE PAR PRESSAGE À CHAUD D'UNE ÉBAUCHE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0671357 (SINTOKOGIO LTD); | [A]DE19944722 (PANKNIN WALTER [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2003010928 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]DE112016003905T (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) |