EP3977140 - APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING REAGENTS TO A FLOW CYTOMETRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartorius BioAnalytical Instruments, Inc. 565 Johnson Avenue Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Sartorius BioAnalytical Instruments, Inc. 565 Johnson Avenue Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | ||
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Essen Instruments, Inc. d/b/a Essen BioScience, Inc. 300 West Morgan Road Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Stephen Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | 02 /
KANE, Zachary Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | 03 /
BENNETT, Richard Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | 04 /
BARRETT, Jason Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/14] | 01 /
BARNES, Stephen c/o Essen Instruments, Inc. D/b/a/ Essen Bioscience, Inc. 300 West Morgan Road Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | ||
02 /
KANE, Zachary c/o Essen Instruments, Inc. D/b/a/ Essen Bioscience, Inc. 300 West Morgan Road Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | |||
03 /
BENNETT, Richard c/o Essen Instruments, Inc. D/b/a/ Essen Bioscience, Inc. 300 West Morgan Road Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | |||
04 /
BARRETT, Jason c/o Essen Instruments, Inc. D/b/a/ Essen c/o Essen Instruments, Inc. D/b/a/ Essen Bioscience, Inc. 300 West Morgan Road Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/14] | Schmidt, Christian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20721860.3 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US24382 | Priority number, date | US201916422814 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: US201916422814 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020242562 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977140 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977140 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10, G01F23/20, G01N15/14, G01N35/02, G01N15/10, G01N35/00, B01L9/00, G01N35/08 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G01N35/10 (EP);
G01N15/1404 (US);
B01F31/22 (US);
B01L13/02 (EP);
B01L3/508 (US);
B01L3/50853 (EP);
B01L9/00 (US);
G01N35/00603 (US);
B01F2101/23 (US);
B01L2200/04 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (US);
B01L2200/143 (EP,US);
B01L2300/021 (EP);
B01L2300/042 (EP);
B01L2300/043 (EP);
B01L2300/0609 (US);
G01F23/20 (EP);
G01N15/1459 (EP);
G01N2015/1006 (EP);
G01N2035/00524 (EP);
G01N2035/1025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON REAGENZIEN ZU EINEM DURCHFLUSSZYTOMETRIESYSTEM | [2022/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING REAGENTS TO A FLOW CYTOMETRY SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | APPAREIL SERVANT À FOURNIR DES RÉACTIFS À UN SYSTÈME DE CYTOMÉTRIE EN FLUX | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6221021 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-34* paragraphs [0001] , [0003]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]JP2004264229 (KYOWA MEDEX CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0028] , [0046] - [0050]; figures 3-4 *; | [A] - Intellicyt, "iQue Screener PLUS", (20161201), URL: https://intellicyt.com/wp-content/uploads/2016/07/iQue-Screener-PLUS-Manual.pdf, (20200602), XP055700184 [A] 1-34 * pages 51-53 * |