EP3966474 - TRANSMISSION COMPRISING A HOUSING PART AND A FIRST SHAFT, IN PARTICULAR A DRIVE SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEGELTIJA, Miki Schumannstr. 4 76689 Karlsdorf-Neuthardt / DE | 02 /
BÜHN, Oliver Portugieserweg 11 76703 Kraichtal / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20722999.8 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP25184 | Priority number, date | DE20191003166 | 06.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019003166 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020224799 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966474 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3966474 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/021, // F16H1/12 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
F16H57/021 (EP);
F16H1/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | F16H57/021 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBE MIT EINEM GEHÄUSETEIL UND EINER ERSTEN WELLE, INSBESONDERE EINTREIBENDEN WELLE | [2022/11] | English: | TRANSMISSION COMPRISING A HOUSING PART AND A FIRST SHAFT, IN PARTICULAR A DRIVE SHAFT | [2022/11] | French: | TRANSMISSION DOTÉE D'UN ÉLÉMENT CARTER ET D'UN PREMIER ARBRE, EN PARTICULIER ARBRE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 06.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1814911 (FICKETT ERNEST L); | [XDI]US3645153 (NORTHCRAFT RAY V); | [XDI]CN2618002Y (LIMING MACHINERY CO LTD [CN]); | [XAI]DE202006009107U (LIN CHUNG CHUAN [TW]); | [X]DE102012008652 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) | by applicant | US3645153 | CN2618002Y |