EP3958801 - A SENSOR PATCH FOR ATTACHMENT TO A BASE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUND, Kamilla Grove Strandvejen 157B, 2th. 3060 Espergaerde / DK | 02 /
HANSEN, Jais Ask Egelundsvej 7 3630 Jaegerspris / DK | 03 /
MOLZEN, Lars Ulrikkenborg Alle 22, 1. tv. 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | 04 /
WINDEBALLE, Lars, Stendevad Skovledet 28 2830 Virum / DK | 05 /
STROEBECH, Esben Selmersvej 11 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20723281.0 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020DK50113 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA70261 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: DK PA201970261 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020216427 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958801 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958801 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61F5/443, A61F5/445 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61F5/4404 (EP,US);
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61F5/443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORPFLASTER ZUR BEFESTIGUNG AN EINER GRUNDPLATTE | [2022/09] | English: | A SENSOR PATCH FOR ATTACHMENT TO A BASE PLATE | [2022/09] | French: | PATCH DE CAPTEUR DESTINÉ À ÊTRE FIXÉ À UNE PLAQUE DE BASE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6171289 (MILLOT PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [A]WO2007098762 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al); | [A]US2017140103 (ANGELIDES KIMON [US]) | Examination | WO2019094635 | WO2020123771 | other | US6171289 | WO2019094635 | WO2020123771 |