EP3969697 - A LOCK CONFIGURED TO BE OPERATED BY A KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banham Patent Locks Holdings Limited 20 Thornsett Road London SW18 4EF / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states UrbanAlps AG c/o a-connect (group) ag Seefeldstrasse 293 8008 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLDA, Ji í Obránc míru 264 551 01 Jarom / CZ | 02 /
OJEDA, Alejandro Wiesenstrasse 30a 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/12] | Blaser, Stefan Ammann Patent Attorneys Ltd. Schwarztorstrasse 31 P.O. Box 5135 3001 Berne / CH | Application number, filing date | 20724147.2 | 12.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP63217 | Priority number, date | EP20190175228 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19175228 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234054 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969697 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3969697 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/00, E05B29/00, E05B15/08, E05B63/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
E05B19/0047 (EP,US);
E05B15/08 (EP,US);
E05B19/007 (EP);
E05B29/0013 (EP,US);
E05B29/0066 (EP,US);
E05B35/001 (US);
E05B63/0056 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLOSS MIT KONFIGURATION ZUR BEDIENUNG MITTELS EINES SCHLÜSSELS | [2023/20] | English: | A LOCK CONFIGURED TO BE OPERATED BY A KEY | [2022/12] | French: | VERROU CONFIGURÉ POUR ÊTRE COMMANDÉ PAR UNE CLÉ | [2023/20] |
Former [2022/12] | ZUR BETÄTIGUNG MIT EINEM SCHLÜSSEL KONFIGURIERTES SCHLOSS | ||
Former [2022/12] | VERROU CONFIGURÉ POUR ÊTRE ACTIONNÉ PAR UNE CLÉ | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3754422 (STACKHOUSE W) [X] 1-8,10-12,14-16 * the whole document * [A] 9 [I] 13; | [A]AU8232282 (AUSTRALIAN LOCK CO PTY LTD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2018041277 (URBANALPS CZECH S R O [CZ]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2016162363 | WO2018041277 | US9920548 |