EP3953378 - GENE THERAPIES FOR LYSOSOMAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prevail Therapeutics, Inc. 430 East 29th Street Suite 940 New York, NY 10016 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHINN, Herve 430 East 29th Street, Suite 940 New York, New York 10016 / US | 02 /
ABELIOVICH, Asa 20 East 35th Street, Apt. 15E New York, New York 10016 / US | 03 /
HECKMAN, Laura 430 East 29th Street, Suite 940 New York, New York 10016 / US | 04 /
HEFTI, Franz 20 East 74th Street, Apt. 14F New York, New York 10021 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20724264.5 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US27788 | Priority number, date | US201962831840P | 10.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962831840 P | US202062990246P | 16.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062990246 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020210713 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953378 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/475, A61K48/00, C12N15/861 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,US);
A61K35/761 (IL,US);
A61K48/005 (EP,KR);
A61K38/162 (IL,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR);
A61K48/0066 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/0085 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/16 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/2402 (EP,KR);
C12Y302/01045 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2207/20 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0306 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,KR);
C12N2800/22 (EP);
C12N2830/008 (EP);
C12N2830/42 (EP);
C12N2830/48 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | GENTHERAPIEN FÜR LYSOSOMALE ERKRANKUNGEN | [2022/07] | English: | GENE THERAPIES FOR LYSOSOMAL DISORDERS | [2022/07] | French: | THÉRAPIES GÉNIQUES POUR TROUBLES LYSOSOMAUX | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2012027558 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [I] 11-20,25,27,28 * The query sequence SEQ ID NO:20 has 100 % identity (100 % similarity) over 23 positions in a common overlap (range (q:s): 23-1:1-23) with subject GSN:AZT83218 (length: 23) from WO2012027558-A2 published on 2012-03-01. *; | [I]WO2014071282 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [I] 1-28 * examples 1-7 *; | [I]WO2016179497 (SHIRE HUMAN GENETIC THERAPIES [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * examples 1-8; claims 1-44 *; | [I] - AGNIESZKA CIESIELSKA ET AL, "Cerebral Infusion of AAV9 Vector-encoding Non-self Proteins Can Elicit Cell-mediated Immune Responses", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, US, (20130101), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1038/mt.2012.167, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 158 - 166, XP055700835 [I] 1-28 * page 158 - page 166 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.167 | [I] - LLUIS SAMARANCH ET AL, "AAV9-mediated Expression of a Non-self Protein in Nonhuman Primate Central Nervous System Triggers Widespread Neuroinflammation Driven by Antigen-presenting Cell Transduction", MOLECULAR THERAPY : THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, US, (20140201), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1038/mt.2013.266, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 329 - 337, XP055701101 [I] 1-28 * page 158 - page 166 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2013.266 | [A] - Digitalcommons@unmc Digitalcommons@unmc ET AL, "Novel therapeutic approaches for Juvenile Neuronal Ceroid Novel therapeutic approaches for Juvenile Neuronal Ceroid Lipofuscinosis (CLN3) Lipofuscinosis (CLN3)", Part of the Medical Neurobiology Commons, (20170101), URL: https://digitalcommons.unmc.edu/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?article=1230&context=etd, XP055694551 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | US8945918 | WO2017184879 | US9879282 | WO2019070894 | WO2019070891 | - ALEXOPOULOU et al., BMC Cell Biol., (20080000), vol. 9, page 2 | - TOMOE et al., Gene, (20020000), vol. 297, no. 1-2, pages 21 - 32 | - MOKREJS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20060000), vol. 34, pages D125 - 30 | - LIU et al., Sci Rep., (20170000), vol. 7, page 2193 | - MCCARTY et al., Gene Ther., (20030000), vol. 10, no. 26, pages 2112 - 8 | - LING et al., JMol Genet Med, (20150000), vol. 9, page 3 | - WANG et al., JMol Biol, (19950000), vol. 250, no. 5, pages 573 - 80 | - FRANCOIS et al., J. Virol., (20050000), vol. 79, no. 17, pages 11082 - 11094 | - URABE et al., Hum Gene Ther, (20020000), vol. 13, no. 16, pages 1935 - 43 | - SMITH et al., Mol Ther, (20090000), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1888 - 1896 | - ALBRIGHT et al., Mol Ther., (20180207), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 510 - 523 | - ROSARIO et al., Mol Ther Methods Clin Dev., (20160000), vol. 3, page 16026 | - SAMULSKI et al., J Virol., (19890000), vol. 63, no. 9, pages 3822 - 8 | - WRIGHT, Hum Gene Ther., (20090000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 698 - 706 | - SVENNERHOLM et al., Clin Genet., (19860000), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 131 - 5 | - COX, Biologics, (20100000), vol. 4, pages 299 - 313 | - GOKER-ALPAN et al., JPediatr., (20030000), vol. 143, no. 2, pages 273 - 6 | - ROSHANSIDRANSKY, Diseases, (20170000), vol. 5, no. 1, page E10 | - GOKER-ALPAN et al., J Pediatr., (20030000), vol. 143, no. 2, pages 273 - 6 | - TYLKI-SZYMANSKA et al., J Inherit Metab Dis., (20100000), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 339 - 46 | - BIEGSTRAATEN et al., Brain, (20100000), vol. 133, no. 10, pages 2909 - 2919 | - HAKIMMATHIESON, Neurology, (19790000), vol. 29, no. 9, pages 1209 - 14 | - VANNUCCIVANNUCCI, Am JPhys Anthropol., (20190000), vol. 168, no. 2, pages 247 - 6 1 | - DEBINSKI et al., Expert Rev Neurother., (20090000), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 1519 - 27 | - MAZZULLI et al., Cell, (20110000), vol. 146, no. 1, pages 37 - 52 | - LIOU et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20060000), vol. 281, no. 7, pages 4242 - 4253 | - SUN et al., J. Lipid Res., (20050000), vol. 46, pages 2102 - 2113 | - FARFEL-BECKER et al., Dis. Model Mech., (20110000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 746 - 752 | - VARDI et al., J Pathol., (20160000), vol. 239, no. 4, pages 496 - 509 | - GRABOWSKI et al., Ann. Intern. Med., (19950000), vol. 122, no. 1, pages 33 - 39 | - MANNING-BOG et al., Neurotoxicology, (20090000), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 1127 - 32 | - FARFEL-BECKER et al., Dis Model Mech., (20110000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 746 - 52 | - ROCHA et al., AntioxidRedox Signal., (20150000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 550 - 64 | - SUN et al., J Lipid Res., (20050000), vol. 46, no. 10, pages 2102 - 13 | - XU et al., Mol GenetMetab., (20110000), vol. 102, no. 4, pages 436 - 47 | - KUO et al., Hum Mol Genet., (20100000), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 1633 - 50 | - ROCKENSTEIN et al., Hum Mol Genet., (20160000), vol. 25, no. 13, pages 2645 - 60 | - PAPADOPOULOS et al., Hum Mol Genet., (20180000), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 1696 - 1710 | - HAMBYSOFRONIEW, Neurotherapeutics, (20100000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 494 - 506 | - FARFEL-BECKER et al., Dis. ModelMech., (20110000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 746 - 752 | - FARFEL-BECKER et al., Hum Mol Genet., (20110000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1375 - 86 | - BOOTH et al., Trends Neurosci., (20170000), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 358 - 70 | - MCMAHON et al., Mol GenetMetab., (20180000), vol. 123, no. 2, page S93 | - HINDERER et al., Mol Ther., (20140000), vol. 22, no. 12, pages 2018 - 27 | - HINDERER et al., Mol Ther Methods Clin Dev., (20140000), vol. 1, page 14051 | - HINDERER et al., Mol Ther., (20150000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 1298 - 307 | - HINDERER et al., Mol Genet Metab., (20160000), vol. 119, no. 1-2, pages 124 - 30 | - BUTT et al., Toxicol Pathol., (20150000), vol. 43, pages 513 - 8 | - CHAMANZA et al., Toxicol Pathol., (20100000), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 642 - 57 | - SARDI et al., Proc NatlAcad Sci USA, (20110000), vol. 108, no. 29, pages 12101 - 6 |