EP3965588 - BINDING SYRUP COMPOSITION COMPRISING ALLULOSE AND LOW SUGAR SYRUPS, PRODUCTS CONTAINING THE SYRUP COMPOSITION AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORN Products Development Inc. 5 Westbrook Corporate Center Westchester, IL 60154 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICOZ, Didem 10 Finderne Avenue Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
PARK, Matthew 10 Finderne Avenue Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20724724.8 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US29700 | Priority number, date | US201962844829P | 08.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962844829 P | US201962895253P | 03.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962895253 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020226909 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965588 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965588 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23L7/126, A23L29/30, A23L33/125 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C07H3/02 (EP,KR);
A23L29/30 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/125 (EP,KR);
A23L7/126 (EP,KR,US);
C07H3/04 (EP,KR);
C07H3/06 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINDENDE SIRUPZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ALLULOSE UND ZUCKERARMEM SIRUP, PRODUKTE MIT DER SIRUPZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/11] | English: | BINDING SYRUP COMPOSITION COMPRISING ALLULOSE AND LOW SUGAR SYRUPS, PRODUCTS CONTAINING THE SYRUP COMPOSITION AND METHODS OF MAKING | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SIROP DE LIAISON COMPRENANT DE L'ALLULOSE ET DES SIROPS À FAIBLE TENEUR EN SUCRE, PRODUITS CONTENANT LA COMPOSITION DE SIROP ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Observations by third parties | 11.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24187882.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015072065 (HOFFMAN ANDREW J [US], et al); | [XDI]WO2015075473 (TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS [US], et al); | [A]US2016015065 (SUMNER ERIC STANLEY [US], et al); | [A]WO2018084535 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]); | [X]US2018279643 (BARKALOW DAVID G [US], et al); | [P]EP3536167 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]) | Examination | US2016302463 | WO2017059363 | by applicant | WO2015075473 | US2016331014 | other | WO2015075473 | US2016015065 | US2017318850 | US2018279643 | KR20190000357 |