EP3966731 - MACHINE LEARNING AN OBJECT DETECTION PROCESS USING A ROBOT-GUIDED CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Deutschland GmbH Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAFRONOV, Kirill Am Brachfeld 26 86169 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
VENET, Pierre Georgenstraße 17 86152 AUGSBURG / DE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Oelke, Jochen KUKA Aktiengesellschaft Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20724784.2 | 05.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP62358 | Priority number, date | DE201910206444 | 06.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206444 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225229 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966731 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06K9/46, G06K9/62 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G06V20/10 (EP,US);
B25J9/163 (US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
G06F18/24133 (EP);
G06T17/00 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/774 (US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V10/87 (US);
H04N23/695 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2210/56 (US);
G06V10/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | MASCHINELLES LERNEN EINER OBJEKTERKENNUNG MITHILFE EINER ROBOTERGEFÜHRTEN KAMERA | [2022/11] | English: | MACHINE LEARNING AN OBJECT DETECTION PROCESS USING A ROBOT-GUIDED CAMERA | [2022/11] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UNE RECONNAISSANCE D'OBJETS À L'AIDE D'UNE CAMÉRA GUIDÉE PAR UN ROBOT | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 02.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE202017001227U (KUKA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0009] *[A] 7; | [XYI] - S. Q. ET AL, "Vision-Guided Robot Control for 3D Object Recognition and Manipulation", Robot Manipulators, InTech, (20080930), doi:10.5772/6223, ISBN 978-953-76-1906-0, XP055577313 [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * page 521, line 32 - page 522, line 4 * * page 523, line 44 - page 524, line 1 * * page 528, line 9 - line 12 * * page 528, line 31 - line 33 * * page 531, line 30 - line 35 * * page 534, line 19 - line 20 * * page 535, line 2 * * page 538, line 26 - page 539, line 2 * * figures 4, 7 * * table 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 3,5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/6223 | [A] - MARIO PEÑA-CABRERA ET AL, "Machine vision approach for robotic assembly", ASSEMBLY AUTOMATION, GB, (20050901), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1108/01445150510610926, ISSN 0144-5154, pages 204 - 2016, XP055713926 [A] 3 * page 211, column 1, line 20 - line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/01445150510610926 |