EP3794484 - BLOCKCHAIN-BASED TRUSTABLE GUARANTEES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alipay (Hangzhou) Information Technology Co., Ltd. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor, Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Xuming c/o ALIPAY (HANGZHOU) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Hui c/o ALIPAY (HANGZHOU) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | 03 /
YE, Guojun c/o ALIPAY (HANGZHOU) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. No. 556 Xixi Road, 8th Floor Section B Suite 801-11, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20725748.6 | 03.02.2020 | [2021/12] | WO2020CN74248 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020098838 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3794484 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3794484 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G06F21/64 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3829 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/389 (US);
G06F16/2365 (US);
G06F16/2379 (US);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/38215 (EP);
G06Q20/4016 (EP);
G06Q20/403 (CN);
G06Q20/405 (EP);
G06Q30/0609 (EP);
H04L9/008 (US);
H04L9/085 (EP,US);
H04L9/0894 (US);
H04L9/3218 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (US);
H04L9/3247 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF BLOCKCHAIN-BASIERENDE VERTRAUENSWÜRDIGE GARANTIEN | [2021/12] | English: | BLOCKCHAIN-BASED TRUSTABLE GUARANTEES | [2021/12] | French: | GARANTIES FIABLES REPOSANT SUR UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - Goldstein Konstantin, "Blockchain: From disruptive concept to business ready solution", (20170614), URL: https://bconference.kz/wp-content/uploads/2017/06/microsoft.pdf, (20210324), XP055789373 [Y] 1-13 * Figure, step 3; page 14 * * Figure, step 5; page 14 * * Figure, bottom; page 14 * * Figure; page 14 * * Figure; page 11 * * page 13 * | [Y] - WANG YUNSEN ET AL, "Designing confidentiality-preserving Blockchain-based transaction processing systems", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ACCOUNTING INFORMATION SYSTEMS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180901), vol. 30, doi:10.1016/j.accinf.2018.06.001, ISSN 1467-0895, pages 1 - 18, XP055789948 [Y] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.accinf.2018.06.001 | [A] - Anonymous, "Privacy and blockchain - Wikipedia", (20191223), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Privacy_and_blockchain&oldid=932132324, (20210325), XP055789911 [A] 1-13 * page 3, paragraph 3 * | [A] - Investopedia Staff, "Standby Letter of Credit (SLOC)", (20180214), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20180214014637/https://www.investopedia.com/terms/s/standbyletterofcredit.asp, (20210324), XP055789415 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2009271618 (CAMENISCH JAN LEONHARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109558517 (UNIV SUN YAT SEN) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109614820 (UNIV SHANDONG) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019205898 (GRECO MAURIZIO [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2019251553 (MA BAOLI [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * description, paragraphs [0020]-[0076] * | Examination | US2019050856 | - Anonymous, "DISTRIBUTED LEDGER TECHNOLOGY AND BANK GUARANTEES FOR COMMERCIAL PROPERTY LEASING", (20170701), URL: https://westpaciq.westpac.com.au/wibiqauthoring/_uploads/file/Whitepaper_-_Bank_Guarantees_DLT_POC_-_FINAL.pdf, (20210419), XP055796708 |