EP3956219 - PROPULSION DEVICE FOR ROTORCRAFT WITH VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING, AND A ROTORCRAFT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH PROPULSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/08] | ROTATING BLADE AERODYNE PROPULSION DEVICE WITH VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING, AND AERODYNE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH PROPULSION DEVICE | ||
[2023/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNDS France 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles Cedex / FR | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states NEXTER Systems 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states NEXTER Systems 34, Boulevard de Valmy 42328 Roanne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUTIER, Pierre Nexter Systems - Service Brevets 7 route de Guerry CS 90328 18023 Bourges / FR | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/08] | 01 /
GAUTIER, Pierre Nexter Systems - Service Brevets 7 route de Guerry CS 90328 18023 Bourges / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20725907.8 | 14.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020IB53493 | Priority number, date | FR20190004060 | 18.04.2019 Original published format: FR 1904060 | [2022/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212836 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956219 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3956219 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/10, B64C27/12, B64C27/80, B64C27/52, B64C27/605, B64C29/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B64C27/12 (EP,US);
B64C27/52 (EP,US);
B64C27/80 (EP);
B64U30/24 (EP,US);
B64C27/605 (EP);
B64C29/0033 (EP,US);
B64U10/17 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DREHFLÜGLER MIT SENKRECHTSTART UND -LANDUNG UND EIN DREHFLÜGLER MIT MINDESTENS EINER SOLCHEN ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/18] | English: | PROPULSION DEVICE FOR ROTORCRAFT WITH VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING, AND A ROTORCRAFT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH PROPULSION DEVICE | [2023/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION POUR AÉRODYNE À VOILURE TOURNANTE ET À DÉCOLLAGE ET ATTERRISSAGE VERTICAUX, ET AÉRODYNE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION | [2022/08] |
Former [2022/08] | ROTORSCHAUFELFLUGKÖRPERANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERTIKALEM START UND LANDUNG UND FLUGKÖRPER MIT MINDESTENS EINER SOLCHEN ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2022/08] | ROTATING BLADE AERODYNE PROPULSION DEVICE WITH VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING, AND AERODYNE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUCH PROPULSION DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 16.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2256918 (YOUNG ARTHUR M); | [A]FR1202127 (SNECMA); | [A]WO2006076743 (REHCO LLC [US], et al); | [YA]US7789341 (ARLTON PAUL E [US], et al); | [A]WO2010118643 (LI LIN [CN], et al); | [YA]GB2491129 (BLUE BEAR SYSTEMS RES LTD [GB]); | [A]CN106915457 (UNIV BEIHANG); | [A]CN207328827U (YANTAI JINTAI WELDING EQUIPMENT CO LTD) | Examination | FR2980117 | CN108557070 | by applicant | US2256918 | FR2980117 |