EP3977225 - METHOD FOR CREATING AN ENVIRONMENT MAP FOR USE IN THE AUTONOMOUS NAVIGATION OF A MOBILE ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHERER, Sebastian Nauklerstrasse 23 72074 Tuebingen / DE | 02 /
STELLMANN, Georg Am Zuckerberg 29 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20726127.2 | 18.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP63784 | Priority number, date | DE201910207870 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019207870 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239491 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977225 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977225 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G05D1/0274 (EP,US);
G01C21/3841 (US);
G06Q10/083 (US);
G06T7/579 (US);
G06V20/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | G05D1/02, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINER UMGEBUNGSKARTE FÜR DIE VERWENDUNG BEI DER AUTONOMEN NAVIGATION EINES MOBILEN ROBOTERS | [2022/14] | English: | METHOD FOR CREATING AN ENVIRONMENT MAP FOR USE IN THE AUTONOMOUS NAVIGATION OF A MOBILE ROBOT | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE D'ENVIRONNEMENT POUR L'UTILISATION LORS DE LA NAVIGATION AUTONOME D'UN ROBOT MOBILE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 03.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013060461 (WONG LISA [NZ], et al); | [XI]US2019155296 (MOORE THOMAS [GB], et al) | by applicant | DE102014100658 |