EP3743851 - ACCESSIBLE REMOTE DEPOSIT CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MX Technologies, Inc. 3401 N. Thanksgiving Way Suite 500 Lehi, UT 84043 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKUL, Saumya 3401 N. Thanksgiving Way Suite 500 Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 20726669.3 | 25.03.2020 | [2020/49] | WO2020US24750 | Priority number, date | US201962823651P | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823651 P | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198381 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743851 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06F9/453 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP);
G06Q20/326 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP);
G06Q20/4015 (EP);
G06Q40/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | G06K9/32, G06T7/73, G06F3/0484, G06F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG VON ZUGÄNGLICHEN FERNEINLAGEN | [2020/49] | English: | ACCESSIBLE REMOTE DEPOSIT CAPTURE | [2020/49] | French: | CAPTURE DE DÉPÔT À DISTANCE ACCESSIBLE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 20.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8977571 (BUECHE JR MICHAEL PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,11,15 * Feedback regarding the image 230 in the field of view with respect to the monitoring criteria may be generated and provided to the user 102. In an implementation, the feedback may be provided visually, such as by text or other visual indicators overlaid on the image 230, shown as feedback indicator 235. Alternatively or additionally, feedback may be provided to the user 102 orally, such as through a speaker associated with the mobile device 106. The feedback may advise the user 102 to move the camera 207 or the check 108 or adjust the lighting or the background, for example. The feedback may also advise the user 102 when the image 230 passes the one or more monitoring criteria and to capture the image of the check 108.; column 6, line 63 - column 9, line 43; figure 3 * * At 840, feedback based on the results may be generated and provided visually and/or orally to the user via the camera and/or the mobile device. In an implementation, the feedback may be provided if the image fails to pass the monitoring criteria. The feedback may comprise instructions or guidance for the user to follow to obtain an image of the check in the field of view of the camera that will pass the monitoring criteria. Processing may continue at 830 with the image that is currently in the field of view of the camera (after the user has received and acted on the feedback) being monitored with respect to the monitoring criteria.; column 15, line 10 - column 18, line 20; figures 8,9 * [I] 2-10,12-14; | [I]US2018335928 (VAN OS MARCEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * Tactile outputs are also used in other contexts to enrich the user experience, improve the accessibility of the device to users with visual or motor difficulties or other accessibility needs ...; paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0151] * * Further, electronic device 3300 generates one or more feedbacks (e.g., a visual effect, a sensory feedback, such as a haptic effect, an audio feedback) indicating to the user that the payment has been accepted and that the payment message object now corresponds to a completed (instead of a pending) payment.; paragraph [0996] - paragraph [1011]; figures 32A-33D ** Generating a tactile output (e.g., 3336) provides the user with sensory feedback (e.g., in addition to visual feedback, to supplement visual feedback, or in place of visual feedback) about an operation that will be performed or has been performed by the device, such as that a transfer (e.g., of a message, of a file, of a resource, of a payment) has been successfully completed by the device.; paragraph [1041] - paragraph [1079]; figures 34A-34D * | International search | [A]US2006024647 (CHESNAIS PASCAL R [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document *; | [YA]US2016166930 (BRAV EHREN J [US], et al) [Y] 4-7, 19 * ; para [0046], [0055], [0059], [0087] * [A] 8; | [XY]US9569756 (BUECHE JR MICHAEL PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 9-18, 20 * ; column 7, line 36-51; column 7, line 61 to column 8, line 4; column 8, line 28-44 * [Y] 4-7, 19 | by applicant | US8977571 | US2018335928 |