EP3966469 - STOP ASSEMBLY FOR DAMPER MASSES OF A DAMPER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDER, Jörg Harfenstraße 2 A 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
WIRACHOWSKI, Michael Am Sonnfeld 2 97076 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
KRAM, Matthias Schiestlstr. 25 E 97080 Würzburg / DE | 04 /
SIEMENS, Kyrill Den Haager Straße 18 97084 Würzburg / DE | 05 /
STAMPF, Volker Nachtigallenweg 4 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 06 /
FISCHER, Reinhold Döhlau 14 96528 Frankenblick / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20726725.3 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020EP62817 | Priority number, date | DE201910206575 | 08.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206575 | [2022/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225404 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966469 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/14 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
F16F15/145 (EP,CN,US);
F16F15/136 (CN);
F16F2226/041 (EP,US);
F16F2226/045 (EP,US);
F16F2230/0041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ANSCHLAGANORDNUNG FÜR TILGERMASSEN EINES TILGERSYSTEMS | [2022/11] | English: | STOP ASSEMBLY FOR DAMPER MASSES OF A DAMPER SYSTEM | [2022/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE BUTÉE POUR MASSES D'AMORTISSEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'AMORTISSEMENT | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE102012214214 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 3,4; | [A]DE102012219737 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE102013222647 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-2, 6-7 *; | [A]DE102015212737 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** Absätze [0015], [0051], [0052], [0054]-[0057] *; | [AD]DE102015225635 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102015225635 |