EP3963465 - FILE SYSTEM METADATA DEDUPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cohesity, Inc. 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Anubhav 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 02 /
JAIN, Sachin 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 03 /
TALELE, Shreyas 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 04 /
QIU, Zhihuan 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2022/10] | 01 /
GUPTA, Anubhav 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | ||
02 /
JAIN, Sachin 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | |||
03 /
TALELE, Shreyas 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | |||
04 /
QIU, Zhihuan 300 Park Ave. San Jose, CA 95110 / US | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20727042.2 | 29.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020US30511 | Priority number, date | US201962840614P | 30.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962840614 P | US202016854153 | 21.04.2020 Original published format: US202016854153 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223375 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963465 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3963465 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/174 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06F16/1748 (EP);
G06F16/174 (US);
G06F16/14 (US);
G06F16/184 (US);
G06F16/9027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATEISYSTEM-METADATEN-DEDUPLIZIERUNG | [2022/10] | English: | FILE SYSTEM METADATA DEDUPLICATION | [2022/10] | French: | DÉDUPLICATION DE MÉTADONNÉES DE SYSTÈME DE FICHIERS | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24184870.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016026652 (ZHENG LING [US]); | [A]US2016034356 (ARON MOHIT [US], et al); | [XI]WO2018075042 (HITACHI LTD); |