EP3970154 - CORRECTING AN EXAMINATION REPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLASSEN, Prescott, Peter High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
TAHMASEBI MARAGHOOSH, Amir, Mohammad High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MANKOVICH, Gabriel, Ryan High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
VAN OMMERING, Robbert, Christiaan High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20727164.4 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020EP62875 | Priority number, date | US201962848138P | 15.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962848138 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020229348 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970154 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H15/00, G10L15/08, G16H50/20 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G06F40/174 (US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06V30/41 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | KORREKTUR EINES UNTERSUCHUNGSBERICHTS | [2022/12] | English: | CORRECTING AN EXAMINATION REPORT | [2022/12] | French: | CORRECTION D'UN RAPPORT D'EXAMEN | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012203575 (TULIPANO PAOLA KARINA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] - [0030] - [0032] , [0033] , [0038] - [0041] * [I] 6,13; | [Y]US2014012579 (GANONG III WILLIAM F [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0019] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0063] - [0074] - [0116] - [0120] *; | [Y] - TAHMASEBI AMIR M ET AL, "Automatic Normalization of Anatomical Phrases in Radiology Reports Using Unsupervised Learning", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING, SPRINGER-VERLAG, CHAM, vol. 32, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10278-018-0116-5, ISSN 0897-1889, (20180803), pages 6 - 18, (20180803), XP036707756 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 7, column 2, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 8, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 11, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 14, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10278-018-0116-5 |