EP3976901 - ARRANGEMENT FOR SECURING A PANEL IN A RAIL BY TIGHTENING OUTER WEDGES FROM AN INNER SIDE OF THE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SB Ingénierie 76, Chemin des Poses 74330 Poisy / FR | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states SB Ingénierie 76, Chemin des Poses 74330 Poisy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIACOMETTI, Sylviane 76 chemin des Poses 74330 Poisy / FR | 02 /
CHAPEL, Romain 480 impasse de l'Agruy 74540 Saint-Silvestre / FR | 03 /
ROUIF, Léandre 27 avenue François Favre 74000 Annecy / FR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Les Pleïades 24C Park Nord Route de la Bouvarde 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20727300.4 | 25.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP64396 | Priority number, date | FR20190005808 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: FR 1905808 | [2022/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239670 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976901 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3976901 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
E04F11/1853 (EP,US);
B65G35/00 (CN);
E04F11/1812 (US);
B65G49/063 (CN);
E04F11/1834 (EP);
E04F2011/1823 (EP);
E04F2011/1895 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 26.11.2021 | TN | 26.11.2021 | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER PLATTE IN EINER SCHIENE DURCH ANZIEHEN VON AUSSEN LIEGENDEN KEILEN VON EINER INNENSEITE DER PLATTE HER | [2022/43] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR SECURING A PANEL IN A RAIL BY TIGHTENING OUTER WEDGES FROM AN INNER SIDE OF THE PANEL | [2022/14] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR LA FIXATION D'UN PANNEAU DANS UN RAIL PAR SERRAGE DE COINS EXTÉRIEURS DEPUIS UN CÔTÉ INTÉRIEUR DU PANNEAU | [2022/14] |
Former [2022/14] | ANORDNUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER PLATTE IN EINER SCHIENE DURCH ANZIEHEN VON ÄUSSEREN KEILEN VON EINER INNENSEITE DER PLATTE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP2921607 (SB INGÉNIERIE [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102016112775 (BOHLE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0025] - [0029] ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP3323958 (SB INGENIERIE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] - [0020] - [0026] - [0029] - [0043] - [0056] - [0069] , [0070] * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | EP2921607 |