EP3976838 - COMPONENT FROM A FLAT STEEL PRODUCT, AND METHOD OF MAKING A METHOD FOR SUCH COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/14] | COMPONENT PRODUCED BY FORMING A SHEET STEEL BLANK, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAID COMPONENT | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FECHTE-HEINEN, Rainer Morianstraße 26 46238 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
GERBER, Thomas Grotenbachstraße 35a 44225 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
KERN, Andreas Dechant-Veiders-Straße 68 40885 Ratingen / DE | 04 /
KUCHAR, Branko Zur alten Exerzierhalle 35 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
NIESSEN, Thomas Stolberger Straße 223 52068 Aachen / DE | 06 /
STÖTZEL, Tim Auf dem Wingertsberg 14 56566 Neuwied / DE | 07 /
THOMAS, Ingo Jahnstraße 53 47119 Duisburg / DE | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20727675.9 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP64830 | Priority number, date | EP20190177256 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19177256 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239905 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976838 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/13, C22C38/38, C23C2/12, C23C2/40, C22C38/32, C23C2/28, C21D1/25, C21D1/18, C21D6/00, C22C38/26, C21D7/02, C22C38/06, C21D7/10, C21D8/02, C21D8/04, C21D9/08, C21D9/48, C22C38/04, // C21D1/673, C25D5/36, C25D7/06 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
C22C38/04 (EP);
C23C2/28 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D1/25 (EP);
C21D6/002 (EP);
C21D6/005 (EP);
C21D7/02 (EP);
C21D7/10 (EP);
C21D7/13 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0426 (EP);
C21D8/0436 (EP);
C21D8/0463 (EP);
C21D9/08 (EP);
C21D9/48 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP);
C23C2/12 (EP);
C23C2/40 (EP);
C21D1/673 (EP);
C21D2211/004 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | C21D1/18, C21D6/00, C21D7/02, C21D7/10, C21D7/13, C21D8/02, C21D8/04, C21D9/08, C21D9/48, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/26, C22C38/32, C22C38/38, C21D1/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | BAUTEIL, HERGESTELLT DURCH UMFORMEN EINER STAHLBLECHPLATINE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/14] | English: | COMPONENT FROM A FLAT STEEL PRODUCT, AND METHOD OF MAKING A METHOD FOR SUCH COMPONENT | [2024/41] | French: | COMPOSANT FAIT À PARTIR D'UN PRODUIT PLAT EN ACIER, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/14] | COMPONENT PRODUCED BY FORMING A SHEET STEEL BLANK, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAID COMPONENT | ||
Former [2022/14] | COMPOSANT RÉALISÉ PAR FORMAGE D'UN LARGET DE TÔLE D'ACIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 29.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1693476 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP4134355B ; | [IA]JP2012180594 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]WO2013182621 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG [DE]); | [A]EP2881486 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]); | [A]EP2881487 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL [CN]) |