EP3977674 - KNOWLEDGE PROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Nchain Holdings Limited Fitzgerald House 44 Church Street St. John's / AG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHAB, Jad c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 02 /
ZHANG, Wei c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 03 /
DOIRON, Brock c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 04 /
WRIGHT, Craig c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Townsend, Martyn, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20727703.9 | 21.04.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020IB53762 | Priority number, date | GB20190007397 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: GB 201907397 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020240289 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977674 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04L9/3252 (EP,CN,US);
H04L9/3218 (KR);
H04L9/3271 (EP,CN,KR);
G06Q40/04 (CN);
H04L67/104 (CN);
H04L9/3066 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | WISSENSNACHWEIS | [2022/14] | English: | KNOWLEDGE PROOF | [2022/14] | French: | PREUVE DE CONNAISSANCE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 01.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010308978 (BROWN DANIEL RICHARD L [CA]); | [A]WO2018225053 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL]); | [A]WO2019034951 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) |