EP3963498 - USING BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTIONS TO PROVIDE OFF-CHAIN FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Nchain Holdings Limited Fitzgerald House 44 Church Street St. John's / AG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARTAN, Chloe c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 02 /
AMMAR, Bassem c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Jack c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 04 /
WAHAB, Jad c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 05 /
ZHANG, Wei c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 06 /
VAUGHAN, Owen c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 07 /
WRIGHT, Craig c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Townsend, Martyn, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20727840.9 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020IB53816 | Priority number, date | GB20190007346 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: GB 201907346 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020240298 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963498 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/64, H04L9/32 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,KR);
G06F21/6227 (US);
G06F9/4484 (US);
G06F9/466 (US);
G06F9/485 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BLOCKCHAIN-TRANSAKTIONEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON OFF-CHAIN-FUNKTIONALITÄT | [2022/10] | English: | USING BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTIONS TO PROVIDE OFF-CHAIN FUNCTIONALITY | [2022/10] | French: | UTILISATION DE TRANSACTIONS DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS POUR FOURNIR UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ HORS CHAÎNE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018116105 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * figures 1,4,9a,9b * * page 8 - page 17 *; | [XI] - Andreas M. Antonopoulos, "Mastering Bitcoin - Unlocking Digital Cryptocurrencies", Mastering bitcoin : [unlocking digital cryptocurrencies], Beijing Cambridge Farnham Köln Sebastopol Tokyo, O'Reilly Media, (20141220), ISBN 978-1-4493-7404-4, XP055306939 [X] 1,32,33 * page 129, paragraph 3 * * page 129, paragraph 4 * * figures 5-1 * * page 125, paragraph 3 * * page 129, paragraph 5 * * figures 5-3,5-4 * [I] 2-31 | [A] - Anonymous, "OP_CHECKSIG - Bitcoin Wiki", (20190116), URL: https://en.bitcoin.it/w/index.php?title=OP_CHECKSIG&oldid=66023, (20200114), XP055657864 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * | [A] - AUGUSTANA DIGITAL COMMONS ET AL, "Augustana College Data Insertion in Bitcoin' s Blockchain Augustana Digital Commons Citation Data Insertion in Bitcoin's Blockchain", SCRIPT. 4. TRANSACTION MALLEABILITY. 5. OP RETURN. 6. COINBASE. 7. FREE SPEECH, (20170101), XP055464096 [A] 1-33 * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6 - page 9 * |