EP3975739 - FROZEN AERATED CONFECTION COMPRISING A MILK FAT FRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818LE Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERBOOM, Franciscus Johannes Gerardus c/o FrieslandCampina Corporate & Support / Intellectual Property Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 02 /
KLOEK, William c/o FrieslandCampina Corporate & Support / Intellectual Property Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 03 /
CUSTINNE, Marc Jacques Christian Maurice c/o FrieslandCampina Corporate & Support / Intellectual Property Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | FrieslandCampina IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20728473.8 | 26.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP64490 | Priority number, date | EP20190176805 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: EP 19176805 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020239717 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975739 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/04, A23G9/32, A23G9/46 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A23G9/327 (EP,KR);
A23G9/04 (EP,KR);
A23G9/34 (KR);
A23G9/38 (KR);
A23G9/46 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | GEFRORENES, BELÜFTETES KONFEKT MIT EINEM MILCHFETTANTEIL | [2022/14] | English: | FROZEN AERATED CONFECTION COMPRISING A MILK FAT FRACTION | [2022/14] | French: | CONFISERIE AÉRÉE SURGELÉE COMPRENANT UNE FRACTION DE MATIÈRE GRASSE DU LAIT | [2023/51] |
Former [2022/14] | CONFISERIE AÉRÉE CONGELÉE COMPRENANT UNE FRACTION DE MATIÈRES GRASSES LAITIÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 10.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6228417 (HIDAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17* column 2 *; | [Y]WO2006066979 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 36 - page 8, line 9; example -; claim - *; | [X]JP2007282535 (ADEKA CORP) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP3289884 (SAVENCIA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0010] - [0022]; example -; claim - *; | [Y] - DEFFENSE E, "MILK FAT FRACTIONATION TODAY: A REVIEW1", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY (JAOCS), SPRINGER, DE, (19931201), vol. 70, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF02564225, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 1193 - 1201, XP000416952 [Y] 1-17 * pages 1193, 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02564225 | by applicant | WO2006066979 | JP2007282535 | WO2013151423 | EP3289884 | - H.D. GOFF, AgroFood industry hi-tech, (20090700), vol. 20n4, pages 43 - 45 | - DEFFENSE, E.M.J., Fat Sci. Technol., (19870000), vol. 89, pages 502 - 507 | - G.A. VAN AKEN et al., JAOCS, (19990000), vol. 76, no. 11, pages 1323 - 1331 | - "Fractionation of Fats", Physical Properties of Lipids, pages 411 - 447 | WO2019EP60729 |