EP3977683 - DEVICE FOR A SUBSCRIBER STATION OF A SERIAL BUS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION IN A SERIAL BUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWICH, Florian Lerchenstr. 17/1 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
WALKER, Steffen Matheus-Wagner-Str. 12 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
MUTTER, Arthur Ziegelei 16 73765 Neuhausen / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20728744.2 | 27.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP64670 | Priority number, date | DE201910208059 | 03.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019208059 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020244985 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977683 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3977683 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L12/413 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/40 (EP);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L12/4013 (US);
H04L12/4135 (EP);
H04L2012/40215 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE TEILNEHMERSTATION EINES SERIELLEN BUSSYSTEMS UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM SERIELLEN BUSSYSTEM | [2022/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR A SUBSCRIBER STATION OF A SERIAL BUS SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION IN A SERIAL BUS SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR UNE STATION D'ABONNÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE BUS SÉRIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE BUS SÉRIE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 03.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0940950 (ST MICROELECTRONICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0020] *; | [A]DE102015209196 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * |