EP3990055 - DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHL Medical AG Gubelstrasse 22 PO Box 7710 6302 Zug / CH | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Ming-Ting Scandinavian Health Ltd No 36, Liufu Rd, Luzhu Ditrict Taoyuan City, Taiwan 338 / TW | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20730079.9 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP65851 | Priority number, date | EP20190182613 | 26.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19182613 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259997 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990055 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/315, G09B23/28 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61M5/3157 (EP);
G09B23/285 (EP,US);
A61M5/2422 (US);
A61M5/31501 (US);
A61M2005/31508 (US);
A61M2005/3151 (EP);
A61M2205/106 (EP);
A61M2205/43 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M5/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAINIEREN DER ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG | [2022/18] | English: | DRIVE MECHANISM FOR A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY TRAINING DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE DE L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 26.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017140452 (CAREBAY EUROPE LTD [MT]) [A] 1-15 * page 12, line 19 - page 22, line 4 ** figures 1-9 *; | [XA]WO2017144211 (CAREBAY EUROPE LTD [MT]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 27 - page 17, line 22 * * figures 1-14 * [A] 2-15; | [XI]WO2017153077 (CAREBAY EUROPE LTD [MT]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * page 6, line 13 - page 12, line 7 * * figures 1-18 * [I] 12,15 |