EP3980655 - ROTOR SUPPORT AND VACUUM PUMP WITH SUCH A ROTOR SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOFIELD, Nigel Paul c/o Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Totman, Clare Elizabeth Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20730252.2 | 02.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020EP65222 | Priority number, date | GB20190008277 | 10.06.2019 Original published format: GB 201908277 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020249431 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980655 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3980655 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16C27/06, F01D25/16, F04D19/04, F04D29/059, F04D29/66, F16F1/02, F16F3/12 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F16C27/066 (EP,GB);
F04D19/042 (CN,GB,US);
F01D25/164 (EP);
F04D19/04 (EP);
F04D29/058 (CN);
F04D29/059 (EP,CN,GB,US);
F04D29/668 (EP,GB,US);
F16C27/04 (GB);
F16F1/027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORTRÄGER UND VAKUUMPUMPE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ROTORTRÄGER | [2022/15] | English: | ROTOR SUPPORT AND VACUUM PUMP WITH SUCH A ROTOR SUPPORT | [2022/15] | French: | SUPPORT DE ROTOR ET POMPE À VIDE DOTÉE DUDIT SUPPORT DE ROTOR | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2400701 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-21* page 10; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19709205 (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * page 1, column 2, line 32 - line 42; figures 1,4 *; | [A]GB2415019 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 15 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006131694 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 7; figure 4 *; | [AD]EP2126365 (EDWARDS LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-21 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]GB2557676 (EDWARDS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-21 * page 2, paragraph 5; figures 4-5b * * page 12, paragraph 59 * | Examination | EP2126365 | by applicant | EP2126365 |