EP3980091 - CARTRIDGE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A DIALYSIS SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allmed Medical Care Holdings Limited Building 11, Chiswick Park 566 Chiswick High Road London W4 5YS / GB | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖTZSCH, Thomas c/o Allmed Medical Care Holdings Limited Building 11, Chiswick Park 566 Chiswick High Road London W4 5YS / GB | 02 /
BLUDSZUWEIT-PHILIPP, Catrin c/o Allmed Medical Care Holdings Limited Building 11, Chiswick Park 566 Chiswick High Road London W4 5YS / GB | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20730334.8 | 03.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020IB55223 | Priority number, date | IT20190008403 | 07.06.2019 Original published format: IT201900008403 | [2022/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020245734 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980091 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3980091 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61M1/1666 (EP,KR);
A61M1/1668 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 23.12.2021 | TN | 23.12.2021 | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DIALYSELÖSUNG | [2022/15] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR THE PREPARATION OF A DIALYSIS SOLUTION | [2022/15] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE SOLUTION DE DIALYSE | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 28.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2022 | Decision despatched | 28.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 28.02.2024 | |
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE29718407U (MAINOPHARM PHARMAZEUTISCHE FAB [DE]); | [A]WO0057935 (GAMBRO LUNDIA A B [SE]); | [A]WO2006120415 (IMI VISION LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]WO2012041790 (AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INT BV [NL], et al); | [A]DE202014104252U (NEPHTEC GMBH [DE]) |