EP3969871 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOGNIZING THE PRESENCE OF LEAKAGES FROM SEALED CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ft System S.r.l. Via L. Da Vinci 117 29010 Alseno (PC) / IT | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORESTELLI, Fabio c/o FT System Srl Via L. Da Vinci, 117 29010 Alseno (PC) / IT | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20731556.5 | 14.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020IB54556 | Priority number, date | IT20190006920 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: IT201900006920 | [2022/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020230068 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969871 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3969871 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20, G01M3/22, G01N21/27, G01N21/3504 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G01M3/207 (EP);
G01M3/226 (EP,US);
G01M3/205 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DES VORHANDENSEINS VON LECKAGEN AUS VERSIEGELTEN BEHÄLTERN | [2022/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOGNIZING THE PRESENCE OF LEAKAGES FROM SEALED CONTAINERS | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE DE LA PRÉSENCE DE FUITES À PARTIR DE RÉCIPIENTS SCELLÉS | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5889199 (WONG JACOB Y [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012166585 (AIRWARE INC [US], et al); | [A]DE102014222786 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |