EP3984162 - ENCRYPTING DATA ASSOCIATED WITH DECENTRALIZED IDENTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURDOCH, Brandon MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Ankur MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
BJONES, Ronald John Kamiel Eurphrasia MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
BUCHNER, Daniel James MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20732409.6 | 23.05.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020US34430 | Priority number, date | US201916445106 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: US201916445106 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020256892 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984162 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04L9/0863 (EP);
G06F21/78 (US);
G06F21/604 (US);
H04L9/0822 (US);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0866 (US);
H04L9/3226 (EP);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP);
H04L9/0891 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNG VON MIT DEZENTRALEM IDENTIFIKATOR ASSOZIIERTEN DATEN | [2022/16] | English: | ENCRYPTING DATA ASSOCIATED WITH DECENTRALIZED IDENTIFIER | [2022/16] | French: | CHIFFREMENT DE DONNÉES ASSOCIÉES À UN IDENTIFIANT DÉCENTRALISÉ | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - TAKEMIYA MAKOTO ET AL, "Sora Identity: Secure, Digital Identity on the Blockchain", 2017 IEEE 41ST ANNUAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (COMPSAC), IEEE, vol. 2, doi:10.1109/COMPSAC.2018.10299, ISSN 0730-3157, ISBN 978-1-5386-2667-2, (20180723), pages 582 - 587, (20180608), XP033409765 [X] 1,9 * abstract * * Chapter II: "Related work" * * Chapter IV: "Sora Identity Protocol" * [I] 2-8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMPSAC.2018.10299 | [A] - Andrew Hughes ET AL, "A Primer for Decentralized Identifiers", (20190119), URL: https://w3c-ccg.github.io/did-primer/#did-documents, (20200605), XP055701558 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - GOYAL VIPUL ET AL, Password-Authenticated Session-Key Generation on the Internet in the Plain Model, PERVASIVE: INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PERVASIVE COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 277 - 294, (20100815), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047270455 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-14623-7_15 |