EP3986727 - CHAIN STRING FOR A TIRE CHAIN AND METHODE FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CHAIN STRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/17] | CHAIN STRAND FOR A TIRE CHAIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHAIN STRAND | ||
[2022/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUD Ketten Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co. KG Friedensinsel 73432 Aalen / DE | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEGER, Johannes Freiherr-von-Liebig-Straße 1 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 02 /
RÖSLER, Bernd Philipp-Funk-Str. 14 73433 Aalen / DE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20732529.1 | 08.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP65854 | Priority number, date | DE201910209107 | 24.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019209107 | [2022/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259999 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986727 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3986727 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/08 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
B60C27/08 (EP);
B60C27/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KETTENSTRANG FÜR EINE REIFENKETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KETTENSTRANGS | [2022/17] | English: | CHAIN STRING FOR A TIRE CHAIN AND METHODE FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CHAIN STRING | [2022/52] | French: | BRIN DE CHAÎNE POUR UNE CHAÎNE DE PNEU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BRIN DE CHAÎNE | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/17] | CHAIN STRAND FOR A TIRE CHAIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHAIN STRAND | ||
Former [2022/17] | BRIN DE CHAÎNE POUR UNE CHAÎNE DE PNEU ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN BRIN DE CHAÎNE | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 03.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1747915 (ERLAU AG EISEN DRAHTWERK [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0034]; figure -; claim - * [A] 10,13,15; | [XA]DE102016218913 (RUD KETTEN RIEGER & DIETZ [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 36]; figure -; claim - *[A] 4-8; | [XA]CN108016222 (DEQING GENERAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] - [0 61]; figure -; claim - * [A] 7 |