EP3986948 - BIOBASED URETHANE (METH)ACRYLATE FOR USE IN CLADDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allnex Belgium, S.A. Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HOLEN, Jurgen Roslaer, 67 9400 Ninove / BE | 02 /
VANMEULDER, Guido Donderveldstraat, 54 1651 LOT / BE | 03 /
TIELEMANS, Michel Avenue Roi Albert I, 63 1780 Wemmel / BE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Neirynck, Katrien Gerda Noëlla, et al Allnex Belgium, S.A. Patent Department Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20733271.9 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP66544 | Priority number, date | EP20190180779 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: EP 19180779 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254276 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986948 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/24, C08G18/32, C08G18/67, C08G18/81, C09D175/16, C08G18/79 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/672 (EP,CN);
C09D175/14 (CN,US);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP,CN);
C08G18/6755 (US);
C08G18/73 (US);
C08G18/8175 (EP);
C08K5/17 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | BIOBASIERTES URETHAN(METH)ACRYLAT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER VERKLEIDUNG | [2022/17] | English: | BIOBASED URETHANE (METH)ACRYLATE FOR USE IN CLADDING | [2022/17] | French: | (MÉTH)ACRYLATE D'URÉTHANE BIOSOURCÉ POUR UTILISATION EN BARDAGE | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 18.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP3110868 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-19* page 1;13;14, lines 3-5;25-28;33-35 - page 15;16, lines 1-21;; examples 3-5 *; | [XY]EP3365383 (FISCHERWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * page 1;15;, lines 1-6;18-27; - pages 16-18; examples 1,2; tables ex. 1-2 * [Y] 1-19 | by applicant | EP0760970 | WO2011098272 | WO2014064097 |