EP3986378 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF GEL CONTAINING XYLOGLUCAN AND ALCOHOLS FOR THE CONTROLLED RELEASE OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfasigma S.p.A. Via Ragazzi del '99, 5 40133 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states Alfasigma S.p.A. 5, Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISCOMI, Giuseppe, Claudio 5, Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
MAFFEI, Paola 5, Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | 03 /
BRUNO, Cristiana 5, Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | 04 /
FEDERICI, Mascia 5, Via Ragazzi del '99 40133 Bologna / IT | 05 /
DISPENZA, Clelia Università di Palermo (Dipartimento di Ingegneria) Viale delle Scienze 90128 Palermo / IT | 06 /
SABATINO, Maria, Antonietta Università di Palermo (Dipartimento di Ingegneria) Viale delle Scienze 90128 Palermo / IT | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20733384.0 | 11.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP66181 | Priority number, date | IT20190009273 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: IT201900009273 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254179 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986378 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K38/21, A61K47/10, A61K47/36, A61K9/00 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,CN);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Validation states | TN | 16.12.2021 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN IN FORM VON GEL MIT XYLOGLUCAN UND ALKOHOLEN ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN | [2022/17] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF GEL CONTAINING XYLOGLUCAN AND ALCOHOLS FOR THE CONTROLLED RELEASE OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS | [2022/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES SOUS FORME DE GEL CONTENANT DU XYLOGLUCANE ET DES ALCOOLS POUR LA LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE D'INGRÉDIENTS ACTIFS | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 16.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY] - S. TODARO ET AL, "Radiation Engineering of Xyloglucan Hydrogels", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING TRANSACTIONS, (2016), vol. 49, doi:10.3303/CET1649049, pages 289 - 294, XP055676514 [I] 1,9-17 * page 289, paragraph 1 * * page 290 - page 291 * [Y] 2-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3303/CET1649049 | [Y] - S. Pasta ET AL, "Polysaccharide-based hydrogels for myocardium remodeling", I materiali biocompatibili per la medicina / Biomaterials for Medicine, Universitas Studiorum, (2014), pages 369 - 370, XP055676486 [Y] 2-8 * page 369 * | [A] - K Sarada ET AL, "In-Situ Gelling System: A Review", (201411), pages 76 - 90, URL: http://impactfactor.org/PDF/IJCPR/5/IJCPR,Vol5,Issue4,Article2.pdf, (20200313), XP055676489 [A] 1-17 * page 80 * * abstract * | [A] - YOSHIAKI YUGUCHI ET AL, "Gelation of xyloglucan in water/alcohol systems", CELLULOSE, Netherlands, (200406), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1023/B:CELL.0000025427.60557.40, ISSN 0969-0239, pages 203 - 208, XP055645209 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:CELL.0000025427.60557.40 | by applicant | WO9959549 | US2002019336 | EP1898876 | WO2009028764 | EP3173067 | JP6490134B | - MIYAZAKI S. et al., J Contr Rel, (19980000), vol. 56, page 75 | - KANT A. et al., Pharmacology online, (20110000), vol. 2, page 28 | - TODARO S. et al., Chem. in Eng. Trans., (20160000), vol. 49, pages 289 - 294 | - PASTA S. et al., I materiali biocompatibili per la medicina/Biomaterials for Medicine, Universitas Studiorum, (20140101), pages 369 - 370 |