EP3986181 - METHOD AND MOUNTING FRAME FOR MANUFACTURING A VAPORIZER UNIT FOR AN INHALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Technologies GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMMING, Niklas Heinrich-Hertz-Str. 21 22085 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
CORNILS, Lasse Elbchaussee 204 15 22605 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
JAKLIN, Jan Meißner Str. 60 70736 Fellbach / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Thomas Osterstr. 2 20259 Hamburg / DE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Müller Verweyen Patentanwälte Friedensallee 290 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20733417.8 | 16.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP66601 | Priority number, date | DE201910116450 | 18.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019116450 | [2022/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254307 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986181 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3986181 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/70, A24F40/42, // A24F40/10, B29C45/14, B67C3/02 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A24F40/70 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (CN);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/53 (US);
B29C45/14 (KR,US);
B29C65/48 (KR);
B29C65/56 (KR);
B29C65/78 (KR);
B29C65/787 (KR);
B32B37/02 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | A24F40/70, B67C3/02, A24F40/10, A24F40/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MONTAGESKELETT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERDAMPFERBAUGRUPPE FÜR EINEN INHALATOR | [2022/17] | English: | METHOD AND MOUNTING FRAME FOR MANUFACTURING A VAPORIZER UNIT FOR AN INHALER | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET OSSATURE DE MONTAGE POUR FABRIQUER UN MODULE ÉVAPORATEUR POUR UN INHALATEUR | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 17.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2015289565 (CADIEUX EDMOND J [US], et al); | [A]WO2016049910 (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [XAI]WO2016127361 (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]); | [A]DE202018102268U (REIMER JOCHEN [DE]); | [XAI]CN109247624 (HUIZHOU XINHONGWEI TECH CO LTD) | Examination | US2018303168 | by applicant | EP3025601 | DE102016120803 | DE102017111119 |