EP3987574 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING NITRIDE TILES EACH INTENDED TO FORM AN ELECTRONIC OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre national de la recherche scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEUILLET, Guy CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
ALLOING, Blandine C/O CNRS CRHEA Rue Bernard Grégory 06560 VALBONNE / FR | 03 /
BONO, Hubert CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
DAGHER, Roy CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | 05 /
ZUNIGA PEREZ, Jesus 450 Avenue Saint Philippe, Résidence La Pinède Bât. B 06410 BIOT / FR | 06 /
CHARLES, Matthew CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | 07 /
BUCKLEY, Julien CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | 08 /
ESCOFFIER, René CEA GRENOBLE 17 Rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE Cedex 9 / FR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [2023/45] |
Former [2022/17] | Hautier, Nicolas Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 20733630.6 | 22.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020EP67382 | Priority number, date | FR20190006756 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: FR 1906756 | [2022/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020254695 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3987574 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3987574 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L33/00, C30B25/18 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP,CN);
H01L25/167 (US);
C30B25/183 (EP);
C30B29/403 (EP);
H01L21/786 (US);
H01L25/072 (US);
H01L27/085 (CN);
H01L29/0684 (CN);
H01L29/2003 (CN);
H01L29/66462 (US);
H01L29/778 (CN);
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/0093 (US);
H01L33/12 (CN);
H01L33/24 (CN);
H01L33/32 (CN);
H01L2224/29124 (US);
H01L2224/29166 (US);
H01L2224/29184 (US);
H01L2224/29186 (US);
H01L2224/32145 (US);
H01L2224/83203 (US);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NITRID-KACHELN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN ODER OPTOELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2022/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING NITRIDE TILES EACH INTENDED TO FORM AN ELECTRONIC OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION DE VIGNETTES DE NITRURE DESTINÉES CHACUNE À FORMER UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE OU OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010109126 (ARENA CHANTAL [US]) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0061] - [0064] - [0074]; figures 2F,5C,5D *; | [A] - ZUBIA D ET AL, "Nanoheteroepitaxial growth of GaN on Si by organometallic vapor phase epitaxy", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20000214), vol. 76, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.125608, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 858 - 860, XP012025868 [A] 1-23 * page 858, column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 11; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.125608 | by applicant | - CAO, "Electrical effect of plasma damage in p-GaN Induced by Reactive Ion Etching", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19990000), vol. 75, page 2569 | - CHANG, "The Variation of Ohmic Contacts and Surface Characteristics", J. of the Electrochemical Society, (20020000), vol. 149, no. 7, pages G367 - G369 | - C. E.DREYERA. JANOTTIC. G. VAN DE WALLE, "Absolute surface energies of polar and nonpolar planes of GaN", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (20140000), vol. 89 | - SHIELDS, "Nanopendeo coalescence overgrowth of GaN on etched nanorod array", Phys. Status Solidi C, (20110000), vol. 8, no. 7-8, pages 2334 - 2336 |