EP3980331 - SEAT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recaro Aircraft Seating GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 21 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINMEYER, Klaus Eugen-Reutter-Straße 12 74538 Rosengarten / DE | 02 /
JUNG, Daniel Thomas-Mann-Str. 26 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 03 /
STRECKERT, Michael Breiteichstr. 18 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20733696.7 | 05.06.2020 | [2022/15] | WO2020EP65630 | Priority number, date | DE201910115203 | 05.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019115203 | [2022/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020245359 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3980331 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D11/06, G06Q10/06, G06Q10/02 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
B64D11/06 (EP);
B64D11/00 (EP);
B64D11/0015 (EP);
G06Q10/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/15] | B64D11/00, B64D11/06, G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | SITZSYSTEM | [2022/15] | English: | SEAT SYSTEM | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SIÈGE | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005132407 (BOYER WILLIAM J JR [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007019623 (TELEZYGOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [XY]DE102009001366 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2011314489 (KEEN R MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]GB2524495 (BRITISH AIRWAYS PLC [GB]); | [A]EP3081488 (STELIA AEROSPACE [FR]); | [A]US2017182957 (WATSON PHILIP [US], et al) |