EP3989848 - MEDICAL HAND-HELD INSTRUMENT WITH A REPLACEABLE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHALLER, Michelle Schauinslandweg 12 78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Alina Schwärzenweg 45 78582 Balgheim / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20733920.1 | 15.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020EP66498 | Priority number, date | DE201910117076 | 25.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019117076 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020260054 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989848 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3989848 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3211, A61B17/3213, // A61B90/70 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/3211 (EP);
A61B17/3213 (EP);
A61B2017/32113 (EP);
A61B2090/0813 (EP);
A61B90/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A61B17/3211, A61B17/3213 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES HANDINSTRUMENT MIT AUSTAUSCHBARER KLINGE | [2022/18] | English: | MEDICAL HAND-HELD INSTRUMENT WITH A REPLACEABLE BLADE | [2022/18] | French: | INSTRUMENT À MAIN MÉDICAL ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE LAME REMPLAÇABLE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 17.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4660287 (DECKER JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 50; figures 1-8 * [A] 3,5 [I] 2,8; | [XAI]JP2000185050 (KAI CUTLERY CENTER CO) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * [A] 3-5 [I] 2,8; | [A]JP2007061429 (KAI R&D CENTER CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] *; | [XI]WO2010132027 (TENG JUN PIAO [SG], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * page 8 - page 13; figures 1a-4c,6-8 * [I] 2-5; | [A]US8074364 (NAKAMURA SHOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 60 - line 65; figures 3a-3c ** column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 21 * | Examination | WO2004002335 | by applicant | GB265425 | US1625778 | US2708313 | DE102009007292 | EP2752275 | US2017112522 |