EP3997824 - METHODS, COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES, AND INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AWAD, Yassin Aden c/o Sony Europe Limited Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o Sony Europe Limited Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 03 /
ATUNGSIRI, Samuel Asangbeng c/o Sony Europe Limited Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 04 /
WEI, Yuxin c/o Sony Europe Limited Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20734424.3 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020EP68360 | Priority number, date | EP20190185684 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: EP 19185684 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021004833 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997824 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND INFRASTRUKTURAUSRÜSTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | METHODS, COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES, AND INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION, ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'INFRASTRUCTURE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 06.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017050868 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-21,38-42* page 8, line 3 - line 12 *; | [A]WO2018174577 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-21,38-42 * figures 8, 9, 10 *; | [A]EP3478012 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-21,38-42 * paragraph [0198] *; | EP3606269 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0117]; figures 8, 9, 10 * | by applicant | WO2018127502 | - "Revised SID: Study on NR Industrial Internet of Things (IoT", 3GPP RAN#81 | - 3GPP TS 36.212 version 13.0.0 Release 13 | - "UL data transmission in RRC INACTIVE", HUAWEIHISILICON, R2-168544 | - "Baseline solution for small data transmission in RRC INACTIVE", ERICSSON, R2-168713 | - "New WID: 2-step RACH for NR", ZTE, RP-182894 | - "NR-based Access to Unlicensed Spectrum", QUALCOMM, RP-182878 |