EP4169298 - OVERLAYED CELL ACCESS HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Walter 19462 Upplands Väsby / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Patrik 19133 Sollentuna / SE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 20735113.1 | 23.06.2020 | [2023/17] | WO2020EP67552 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259458 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169298 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/08, H04W74/00, H04W76/10 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W56/0015 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG VON ÜBERLAGERTEM ZELLENZUGANG | [2023/17] | English: | OVERLAYED CELL ACCESS HANDLING | [2023/17] | French: | MANIPULATION D'ACCÈS À DES CELLULES SUPERPOSÉES | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 19.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019110314 (ABEDINI NAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-68 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0036] , [0037] , [0055] , [0056] , [0063] - [0065] - [0071] , [0073] *; | [XI]US2019364599 (ISLAM MUHAMMAD NAZMUL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,19-23,27,39,40,42,53-56,58,61 * paragraphs [0047] , [0062] - [0064] - [0 67] , [0 71] , [0081] , [0 84] , [0 90] - [0094]; claims 1,5 * [I] 4-6,8-18,24-26,28-38,41,43-52,57,59,60,62-68; | [XAI]EP3651404 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,7,19-21,27,39,42,53-55,58,61 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [0 57] - [0060] - [0071] , [0085] , [0 78] * [A] 2-6,9-18,22-26,29-38,40,41,44-52,56,57,60,62-68 [I] 8,28,43,59; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Overview on SON for RDC", vol. RAN WG2, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190406), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1904844 OVERVIEW ON SON FOR RDC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/R2%2D1904844%2Ezip, (20190406), XP051702121 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * |