EP3996849 - VERTICAL ROLLER MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Polysius GmbH Graf-Galen-Str. 17 59269 Beckum / DE | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACHSE, Carsten Im Hagenfeld 79 48147 Münster / DE | 02 /
HÖRENBAUM, Christoph Storchholzstr. 8 59071 Hamm / DE | 03 /
MARTON, Mario Marblicksweg 70 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 04 /
LOCHER, Georg Theodor-Heuss-Straße 18b 59302 Oelde / DE | 05 /
LAMPE, Karl Martinstr. 12 59320 Ennigerloh / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20735283.2 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020EP67079 | Priority number, date | DE201910210047 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210047 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021004757 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996849 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B02C15/04, B02C25/00, B02C15/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B02C15/04 (EP);
B02C15/00 (EP);
B02C25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERTIKAL-ROLLENMÜHLE | [2022/19] | English: | VERTICAL ROLLER MILL | [2022/19] | French: | BROYEUR VERTICAL À ROULEAUX | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 08.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPH03174259 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11,19 * abstract * [A] 3,8,13,16,18 [Y] 12,14,15,17; | [Y]JP2000140663 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [Y] 17 * figures 10-14 ** paragraphs [0047] - [0049] - [0054] , [0055] *; | [YA]US2015151304 (GUERRERO PALMA PEDRO [DE]) [Y] 12,14,15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0031] - [0037] - [0042] , [0043]; figures 1-3,5-8 * [A] 1,19 | by applicant | EP3238824 |