EP3977301 - RUNTIME SERVER FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY EXECUTING MULTIPLE RUNTIME SYSTEMS OF AN AUTOMATION INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Hülshorstweg 20 33415 Verl / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKHOFF, Hans Weidenweg 58 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
BARTH, Ramon Teutoburger Str. 71a 33415 Verl / DE | 03 /
JANSSEN, Dirk Varusweg 40 33415 Verl / DE | 04 /
PAPENFORT, Josef Amtsweg 24 33609 Hüllhorst / DE | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20735570.2 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020EP68413 | Priority number, date | DE201910117954 | 03.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019117954 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001376 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977301 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/17, G05B19/414 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/4145 (EP);
G06F11/3006 (CN);
G05B19/41835 (US);
G05B19/4148 (EP);
G05B19/41865 (US);
G06F11/3051 (CN);
G06F9/44505 (CN);
G05B2219/23217 (US);
G05B2219/24153 (US);
G05B2219/25369 (US);
G05B2219/34258 (EP);
G05B2219/34273 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | LAUFZEITSERVER ZUM GLEICHZEITIGEN AUSFÜHREN MEHRERER LAUFZEITSYSTEME EINER AUTOMATISIERUNGSANLAGE | [2022/14] | English: | RUNTIME SERVER FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY EXECUTING MULTIPLE RUNTIME SYSTEMS OF AN AUTOMATION INSTALLATION | [2022/14] | French: | SERVEUR DE DURÉE D'EXÉCUTION DESTINÉ À LA MISE EN OEUVRE SIMULTANÉE DE PLUSIEURS SYSTÈMES DE DURÉE D'EXÉCUTION D'UNE INSTALLATION D'AUTOMATISATION | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 30.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 16.08.2023 | Appeal received No. T1989/23 | 16.08.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 16.10.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101894045 (JIAN YANG); | [I]US2014074294 (WU BO [CN], et al); | [A]US2017045879 (YANG JIANZHONG [CN], et al); | by applicant | EP2341405 |