EP3999829 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN IMBALANCE OF A VEHICLE WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUSS, Tobias Bei Der Lohmuehle 12 74182 Obersulm / DE | 02 /
HASBERG, Carsten Hoehenweg 12 74360 Ilsfeld-Auenstein / DE | 03 /
EINHORN, Erik Am Kipphut 51a 31157 Sarstedt / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20737454.7 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020EP69236 | Priority number, date | DE201910210656 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210656 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008967 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999829 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/22, G01M17/013, G01M1/28 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G01M1/28 (EP);
G01M1/225 (EP);
G01M17/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER UNWUCHT EINES RADES EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN IMBALANCE OF A VEHICLE WHEEL | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN DÉFAUT D'ÉQUILIBRAGE D'UNE ROUE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 18.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102017006940 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [ 0020] , [ 0024] , [ 0025] ** figure 1 * |